U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Hastings v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 25, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 07, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 04, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 19, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 16, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.