U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Henning Construction Company, LLC v. The Phoenix Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • December 13, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 11, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 07, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 05, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 04, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 18, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.