U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00054
  • Case Name: American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al v. MW Builders, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 07, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 07, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 06, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • April 06, 2021: [Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Leave]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 22, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.