U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Adams et al v. Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • April 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 05, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.