U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04001
  • Case Name: De Britto Bucco et al v. Western Iowa Tech Community College et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Extension of Time]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Quash]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Stay]
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 26, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 08, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 23, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.