U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Huseth v. National Pork Board et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • July 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 23, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.