U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Bills et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 26, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 24, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.