U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Pocket Plus, L.L.C. v. Runner's High
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Seal]
  • October 26, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 09, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.