U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04018
  • Case Name: Harvest International, Inc v. Phoenix Insurance Company, The
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 02, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 13, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.