U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Calacci Construction Co, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Compel]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.