U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Thiel v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Reconsideration]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 31, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • August 30, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 13, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.