U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Great River Entertainment, LLC v. Zurich American Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [USCA Order]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 29, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.