U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02029
  • Case Name: Warner v. Wartburg College
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 22, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.