U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Matters v. Sage Lube Systems, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 01, 2021: [Show Cause]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 12, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 11, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 10, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 10, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.