U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00039
  • Case Name: O'Leary v. Saint Ambrose University
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2022: [Remand]
  • April 22, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Remand]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.