U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Shafer v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.