U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04001
  • Case Name: De Britto Bucco, et al v. Western Iowa Tech Community College, et al Set scheduling report DDL 30 days from filing of order re motions to dismiss
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 03, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.