U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC v. OSK X, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 25, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 08, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 08, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 24, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 05, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 25, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 25, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • June 27, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • June 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • June 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 25, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 24, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 19, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 19, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 12, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 23, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 11, 2022: [Stay]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 27, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 27, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 20, 2022: [Errata]
  • January 20, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 23, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2021: [Brief /Other]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 12, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 12, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • July 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • July 19, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 06, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 06, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 06, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 30, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 17, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 17, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.