U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-03018
  • Case Name: Iowa Pork Producer Association et al v. Bonta et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 23, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 02, 2021: [Stay]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 29, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 29, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 28, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 25, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.