U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Rachford v Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • April 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Brief /Other]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.