U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Templeton v. City of Des Moines et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 16, 2022: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 19, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 19, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 08, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 31, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 16, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • March 15, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 01, 2022: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • March 01, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.