U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00192
  • Case Name: Henry Schein, Inc. v. drea et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 30, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 07, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 02, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Compel]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • August 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 22, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 19, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 09, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 29, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.