U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04017
  • Case Name: Christiansen v. Eral et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 17, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 06, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.