U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00202
  • Case Name: Christner v. Ludderman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.