U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Doe et al v. Lewis Central Community School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 25, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • October 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 11, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 13, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 14, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.