U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-03020
  • Case Name: Burke et al v. Winnebago Industries Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 12, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 12, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 05, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.