U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00287
  • Case Name: Giles v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • May 17, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • January 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.