U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Brookhart v. Financial Indemnity Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.