U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00056
  • Case Name: McAllister et al v. General Motors LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.