U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00007
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.