U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Elias v. Secura Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.