U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Illinois Casualty Company v. Los Agaves, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.