U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-09020
  • Case Name: Wulff et al v. Kerndt Brothers Savings Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [zGeneric Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 20, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued/Reissued]
  • April 10, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.