U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Businessolver.com, Inc. v. Help at Home Holdings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.