Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02236
    Party Name:United States of America v. Harrington et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Judgment]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Order]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Violation Report]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prob 12C PUBLIC Petition/Order for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prob 12B Request/Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modifying Conditions of Supervision - Consent 12B]
    Date Published:October 22, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?73541
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =