U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-09112
  • Case Name: Wilcoxson v. Cogent Financial Group
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 15, 2016: [Extension of Time]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2015: [Leave]
June, 2015
  • June 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.