open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-10189
    Party Name:Shonnetta Lachan Gabriel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Flags Set-Reset]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement-Granted]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Turnover]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Trustee's Interim Report]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Generic Notice]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Hearing Set (Other)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Hearing]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [BK Petition Preparer's Information]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?253809
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =