open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02239
    Party Name:Paith v Bridges at Foxridge, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Comparative Fault Designation]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?126659
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =