open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:18-20669
    Party Name:Willie Marie Union and Yolonda Marie Union
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set(Motion)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?247814
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =