open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-03016
    Party Name:Arnold (ID 90705) v. Wichita, City of, Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?125129
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =