open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02552
    Party Name:Rios v. Walinga USA, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Place of Trial]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?128317
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =