open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:6:19-cv-01240
    Party Name:Lindeman v. Herndon et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Alias Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?128312
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =