open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02731
    Party Name:Runnels v. Stanley Steemer International, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent to Join]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129460
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =