open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-03265
    Party Name:Trass (ID 80270) v. Reno County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129768
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =