open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:20-cr-20011-1
    Party Name:USA v. Morales-Santiago
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?130432
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =