open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:5:20-cv-03215
    Party Name:White v. McClay et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?132452
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =