U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mj-06031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 29, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 25, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.