U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • April 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 16, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.