U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • May 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.