U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00206
  • Case Name: Olsen v Kraus, Jr.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Report Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Staying Case]
  • May 24, 2021: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.